Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Verallo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rossano

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1497¹BornCori
1537²40.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
Feb 1540³43.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
20 Aug 154043.6AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
14 Nov 154144.8AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
14 Nov 154447.8AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
8 Apr 154952.2Elevated to Cardinal
10 May 154952.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
9 Nov 154952.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Capaccio, Italy
1551¹54.0ResignedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
1 Mar 155356.1ResignedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
29 Nov 155356.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
10 Oct 155558.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rossano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Verallo (VIAF: 74280856)
Girolamo Cardinal Verallo (born 1497, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rossano

  • a cardinal for 6.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Apr 1549
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 155, and Page 286
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 139, and Page 152

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 Sep 2016