Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Antonio Raimondi

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1698Born
20 Mar 173436.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 174243.9AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
28 Jan 174244.0Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
15 Apr 176870.2DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Antonio Raimondi
Bishop Pietro Antonio Raimondi (born , died ) Bishop of Capaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCutro

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 147
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018