Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Savarese

Deceased

Bishop of Vallo di Lucania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1903Born
16 Apr 192723.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 194743.2AppointedBishop of Vallo di Lucania, Italy
13 Apr 194743.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vallo di Lucania, Italy
3 Oct 195551.9DiedBishop of Vallo di Lucania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Savarese
Bishop Domenico Savarese (born , died ) Bishop of Vallo di Lucania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQualiano

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018