Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Teutonico

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aversa, Italy

Titular Bishop of Satafis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1874Born
11 Jul 189722.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 193661.9AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
11 Oct 193662.1Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
31 Mar 196691.5RetiredBishop of Aversa, Italy
31 Mar 196691.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Satafis
31 May 1978103.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Teutonico
Bishop Antonio Teutonico (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aversa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant'Elia a Pianisi

  • a priest for 80.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,976
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,979
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,936, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast