Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Vitelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1559¹Born
4 Mar 159233.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
4 Mar 159233.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
1594²35.0SucceededBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
14 Dec 160950.9AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
21 Dec 161051.9DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Vitelli
Bishop Giovanni Vitelli C.R. (born 1559, died ) Bishop of Capaccio

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 129, and Page 134
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 152, and Page 147
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1592, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018