Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Falivenia (Pastineus), O.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ischia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Sep 1528AppointedBishop of Capri, Italy
2 Jul 1529Ordained BishopBishop of Capri, Italy
24 Apr 1534AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
1548²DiedBishop of Ischia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Falivenia (Pastineus)
Bishop Agostino Falivenia (Pastineus) O.S. (died 1548) Bishop of Ischia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPalais des Papes (Sistine), Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 151, and Page 214
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1529, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast