Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Galeazzo Pietra

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1461²BornPavia
14 Mar 153069.2AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
19 Mar 153069.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
27 Oct 155291.8DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Galeazzo Pietra:
Bishop Galeazzo Pietra (died ) Bishop of Vigevano

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 334
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,803

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013