Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giacomo Juvénal des Ursins

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Bishop of Poitiers


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Oct 1444AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
3 Mar 1449AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
3 Mar 1449AppointedBishop of Poitiers, France
21 Nov 1449AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
1452²ResignedBishop of Fréjus, France
12 Mar 1457DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Juvénal des Ursins
Patriarch Giacomo Juvénal des Ursins (died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 89, and Page 222
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 216, and Page 155

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Mar 2021

Quantcast