Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrando de Romanis

Deceased

Bishop of Fréjus, France


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Feb 1566AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
6 Jan 1567Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
19 Mar 1579DiedBishop of Fréjus, France

MicroData Summary for Bertrando de Romanis
Bishop Bertrando de Romanis (died ) Bishop of Fréjus

EventPlace
Ordained BishopFréjus, Diocese of Fréjus

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 198

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018