Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert-Paul Aragonès d’Orcet

Deceased

Bishop of Langres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1762BornClermont-Ferrand
8 Mar 178825.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 182360.7SelectedBishop of Langres, France
17 Nov 182361.0ConfirmedBishop of Langres, France
25 Jan 182461.1Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
20 Jun 183269.6DiedBishop of Langres, France

MicroData Summary for Gilbert-Paul Aragonès d’Orcet
Bishop Gilbert-Paul Aragonès d’Orcet (born , died ) Bishop of Langres

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 240
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 May 2016