Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin-Jean Le Tourneur

Deceased

Bishop of Verdun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1775BornParis
16 Jun 181034.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 183661.1SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
19 May 183761.5ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
25 Jun 183761.6Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
26 Jan 184468.1DiedBishop of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Augustin-Jean Le Tourneur:
Bishop Augustin-Jean Le Tourneur (born , died ) Bishop of Verdun

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013