Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Placide-Bruno Valayer

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Verdun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1764BornGrillon
14 Oct 183268.0SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
17 Dec 183268.1ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
10 Feb 183368.3Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
20 Aug 183671.8ResignedBishop of Verdun, France
28 Apr 185085.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Placide-Bruno Valayer
Bishop Placide-Bruno Valayer (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Verdun

  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 397
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Aug 2016