Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Bertuzzi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Foligno, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Doclea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1826Born
21 Jan 184922.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 188962.5AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
17 Feb 188962.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
18 Mar 189568.6AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
6 May 191083.8ResignedBishop of Foligno, Italy
6 May 191083.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Doclea
4 Jan 191487.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Bertuzzi
Archbishop Carlo Bertuzzi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Foligno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCento, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 278, and Page 477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 157
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017