Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Romano

Deceased

Bishop of Ischia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1798BornTorre del Greco
20 Sep 181719.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 185455.9SelectedBishop of Ischia, Italy
23 Jun 185456.0ConfirmedBishop of Ischia, Italy
30 Jul 185456.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
3 Aug 187274.1DiedBishop of Ischia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Romano:
Bishop Felice Romano (born , died ) Bishop of Ischia

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013