Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Gallucci

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1813Born
18 Jan 183723.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 186753.3AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
10 Mar 186753.4Ordained BishopBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
3 Oct 189783.9DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Gallucci (VIAF: 72234076)
Bishop Tommaso Gallucci (born , died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncona, Diocese of Ancona e Numana
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 478
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1867, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017