Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Annibale Barabesi

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1829Born
27 Mar 185222.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Mar 185323.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 186737.4AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
10 Mar 186737.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Miniato, Italy
2 Feb 189767.3DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Annibale Barabesi
Bishop Annibale Barabesi (born , died ) Bishop of San Miniato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTatti, Diocese of Grosseto
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 386
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1867, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Feb 2017