Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Maneschi

Deceased

Bishop of Veroli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1813Born
19 Mar 183622.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 186855.6AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
10 Jan 186955.6Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
15 Aug 189178.2DiedBishop of Veroli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Maneschi
Bishop Giovanni Battista Maneschi (born , died ) Bishop of Veroli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoligno, Diocese of Foligno
Ordained BishopVallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 588
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,869, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast