Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rocco de Gregorio

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1803BornLacedonia
23 Sep 182622.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 184339.3SelectedBishop of San Severo, Italy
19 Jun 184339.6ConfirmedBishop of San Severo, Italy
24 Jun 184339.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
8 Jul 185854.6DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rocco de Gregorio:
Bishop Rocco de Gregorio (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013