Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Saverio Cardinal Massimo

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1806BornDresda, Germany
12 Feb 183832.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
24 Jan 184235.9Elevated to Cardinal
24 Jan 184235.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
11 Jan 184841.9DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Massimo:
Cardinal Francesco Saverio Massimo (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 9.9 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013