Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Emilio Cugini

Deceased

Archbishop of Modena (e Nonantola)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1805BornReggio Emilia
22 Jun 182822.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 185246.3AppointedBishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
28 Mar 185246.4Ordained BishopBishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
22 Aug 185549.8AppointedArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
22 Jan 187266.2DiedArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Emilio Cugini
Archbishop Francesco Emilio Cugini (born , died ) Archbishop of Modena (e Nonantola)

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 397
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Dec 2016