Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Saeli, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1833Born
22 Aug 185218.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
25 Mar 185925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
3 Jul 188248.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
3 Jul 188248.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
9 Jul 188248.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
22 Sep 188248.8SucceededBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
5 Mar 190066.2DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Saeli
Bishop Antonio Maria Saeli C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontemaggiore
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 307, and Page 374
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017