Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lodovico Leonardi

Deceased

Bishop of Bertinoro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1819Born
23 Mar 184424.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 188262.5AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
9 Jul 188262.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
Jun 1898³78.4DiedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Leonardi
Bishop Lodovico Leonardi (born , died Jun 1898) Bishop of Bertinoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Lorenzo in Campo
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 157
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017