Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Strocchi

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1824Born
18 Sep 184722.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 188257.4AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
2 Apr 188257.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
1887¹62.1DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Strocchi (VIAF: 89566680)
Bishop Giovanni Maria Strocchi (born , died 1887) Bishop of Cesena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaenza, Diocese of Faenza
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 168
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017