Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ascanio Blasi

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1645Born
23 Sep 170257.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 170257.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
11 Dec 170257.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Salamis
21 Dec 170257.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Salamis
26 Jan 170560.0AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
Jul 1718³73.4DiedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Blasi
Bishop Ascanio Blasi (born , died Jul 1718) Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCivita Castellana, Diocese of Civita Castellana e Orte
Buried Place (Original)right Transept, Cathedral, Civita Castellana, Diocese of Civita Castellana e Orte

  • a priest for 15.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 159, and Page 340
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 38
  • ob/c2: AT, 26 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast