Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Petrucci

Deceased

Bishop of Bisignano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Apr 1582AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
17 Jun 1582Ordained BishopBishop of Strongoli, Italy
23 Jul 1584AppointedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
1598²DiedBishop of Bisignano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Petrucci
Bishop Domenico Petrucci (died 1598) Bishop of Bisignano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCivita Castellana, Diocese of Civita Castellana e Orte
Ordained BishopS. Blaise, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 134, and Page 305
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,582, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast