Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Carnevalini

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1843Born
23 Dec 186522.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 188946.1AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
16 Jun 188946.2Ordained BishopBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
9 Jun 189552.2DiedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Carnevalini
Bishop Giovanni Battista Carnevalini (born , died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Maria in via lata, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 206
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast