Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Taddeo Altini, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1603²BornCamerino
17 Dec 164644.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
21 Dec 164644.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
10 Nov 165350.9AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
27 Aug 168582.7DiedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Taddeo Altini:
Bishop Taddeo Altini O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte

  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 285, and Page 151
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 111, Number 675
  • bd/bp: CB, 18 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014