Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigismondo Isei

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1620Born
16 Sep 164525.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 165535.3AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
12 Sep 165535.3Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
Sep 1670³50.3DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sigismondo Isei
Bishop Sigismondo Isei (born , died Sep 1670) Bishop of Comacchio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesene
Ordained BishopSant’Agostino, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 118, Number 721
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 157
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018