Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrogio Landucci, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1596²BornSiena
30 Aug 165559.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
12 Sep 165559.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
16 Feb 166973.1DiedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Landucci:
Bishop Ambrogio Landucci O.S.A. (died ) Titular Bishop of Porphyreon

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 118, Number 721
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 285
  • bp/bd: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015