Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sante Lanucci

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1686Born
23 Dec 171327.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 174862.1AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
8 Dec 174862.2Ordained BishopBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
31 May 176578.6ResignedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy

MicroData Summary
Sante Lanucci
Bishop Sante Lanucci
(born )
Bishop Emeritus of Civita Castellana e Orte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondavio

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 167
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 19 May 2025