Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fidelis Bufarini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Comacchio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1813Born
4 Nov 183825.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 185441.6AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
17 Dec 185441.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
23 Mar 186046.9AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
26 Mar 186753.9ResignedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
30 Sep 186754.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Comacchio, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Fidelis Bufarini
Bishop Fidelis Bufarini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Comacchio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRecanati
Ordained BishopSs. Jean et Paul, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 28.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 217, and Page 483
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017