Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Zannini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Veroli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1809BornAesin
6 Nov 183122.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 185445.6AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
3 Dec 185445.6Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
9 Dec 185748.6ResignedBishop of Veroli, Italy
1861¹51.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Veroli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Zannini:
Bishop Luigi Zannini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Veroli

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 588

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013