Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdinando Minucci

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1782Born
17 Aug 180624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
28 Jan 182846.0AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
3 Feb 182846.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
2 Jul 185674.4DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Minucci (VIAF: 89288681)
Archbishop Ferdinando Minucci (born , died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVolterra, Diocese of Volterra

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 196
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast