Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Feliciano (Laurentius Joachim) Barbacci, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1800BornPonzacco
Feb 1824³23.9ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
17 Apr 182424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
30 Nov 185454.7AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
3 Dec 185454.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
24 Nov 186969.7DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Feliciano (Laurentius Joachim) Barbacci
Bishop Feliciano (Laurentius Joachim) Barbacci O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Cortona

EventPlace
Birth PlacePonsacco, Diocese of San Miniato
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 227
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016