Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leone Niccolai, O. Cart. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1782Born
20 Dec 180624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Carthusian Order
5 Nov 184967.1AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
9 Dec 184967.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
13 Jul 185774.7DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leone Niccolai (VIAF: 304912059)
Bishop Leone Niccolai O. Cart. (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze
Ordained BishopCathedral, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 456
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,849, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast