Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Todi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1798Born
20 Jan 182223.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 184849.7AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
24 Apr 184849.7Ordained BishopBishop of Todi, Italy
29 Nov 185456.3DiedBishop of Todi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Rossi
Bishop Nicola Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Todi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoligno, Diocese of Foligno
Ordained BishopSs. Vincent et Anastase, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 571
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast