Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Galligari

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Narni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1798BornFoligno
23 Sep 182022.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 184244.5AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
7 Aug 184244.5Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
17 Dec 185860.9ResignedBishop of Narni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Galligari (VIAF: 259852528)
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Galligari (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Narni

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 276
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Nov 2016