Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Tamburini (Tamberini)

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1782BornImola
31 May 180623.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 183452.0AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
5 Oct 183452.0Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
22 Jul 184259.8AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
13 Oct 185977.1DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Tamburini (Tamberini):
Bishop Gioacchino Tamburini (Tamberini) (born , died ) Bishop of Cervia

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 146, and Page 276

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013