Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fortunato de São Boaventura, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1777³Born
19 Sep 180124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
3 Oct 183154.4SelectedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
24 Feb 183254.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
27 May 183255.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
6 Dec 184467.6DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fortunato de São Boaventura (VIAF: 45872505)
Archbishop Fortunato de São Boaventura O. Cist. (born , died ) Archbishop of Évora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcobaça
Ordained BishopLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 185
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,531
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 19
  • ob: CB, 20 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017