Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Giustiniani

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1778BornGenoa, Italy
6 Apr 182244.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 182244.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
21 Apr 182244.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
26 Apr 182244.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sicily, Italy
24 Apr 182749.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
30 Sep 183153.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
2 Jul 183254.4Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jul 183254.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
19 Dec 183456.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
11 Oct 184365.6DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Giustiniani
Alessandro Cardinal Giustiniani (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Portugal

  • a priest for 21.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
  • a cardinal for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 303
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1822, Number 11
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Jul 1832

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 May 2016