Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José António da Silva Rebelo, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bragança e Miranda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1779BornSanta Catarina
22 Dec 180425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
18 Nov 183151.9SelectedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
2 Jul 183252.5ConfirmedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
30 Sep 183252.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
7 Nov 184666.9DiedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José António da Silva Rebelo
Bishop José António da Silva Rebelo C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Bragança e Miranda

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 118
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Aug 2016