Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Orlando, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Catania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1756BornPrizzi
18 Sep 177922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
13 Aug 182366.7SelectedBishop of Catania, Italy
24 Nov 182367.0ConfirmedBishop of Catania, Italy
7 Dec 182367.0Ordained BishopBishop of Catania, Italy
21 Apr 183982.4DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Orlando (VIAF: 89315878)
Bishop Domenico Orlando O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Catania

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 142
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Aug 2016