Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco di Paola Berretta

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Catania

Titular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1761BornCatania
24 Sep 178524.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 182866.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Catania, Italy
28 Jan 182866.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
13 Apr 182866.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus

MicroData Summary for Francesco di Paola Berretta:
Bishop Francesco di Paola Berretta (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Catania

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013