Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Saitta

Deceased

Bishop of Patti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1768BornBronte
3 Mar 179224.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 183365.4SelectedBishop of Patti, Italy
30 Sep 183365.7ConfirmedBishop of Patti, Italy
15 Dec 183365.9Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
20 Jun 183870.4DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Saitta:
Bishop Giuseppe Saitta (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 295

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013