Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Pezzella, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi e Teano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1763BornBenevento
8 Dec 178724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
20 Jun 182359.6SelectedBishop of Teramo, Italy
24 Nov 182360.0ConfirmedBishop of Teramo, Italy
7 Dec 182360.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
15 May 182864.5SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
18 Jun 182864.6ResignedBishop of Teramo, Italy
23 Jun 182864.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
23 Jun 182864.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Zela
15 Mar 183066.3SucceededBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
3 Jan 183369.1DiedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Pezzella
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Pezzella O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Calvi e Teano

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 82, and Page 402
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 May 2016