Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo de’ Conti Curoli

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1796BornFaenza
21 Sep 182225.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 183437.9AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
5 Oct 183437.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
26 Jan 184952.2DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo de’ Conti Curoli (VIAF: 88862634)
Bishop Filippo de’ Conti Curoli (born , died ) Bishop of Rieti

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 319
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1834, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Aug 2016