Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Magrini

Deceased

Bishop of Forli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1809Born
22 Jan 183222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rimini, Italy
11 Dec 184839.4AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
4 Feb 184939.5Ordained BishopBishop of Terni, Italy
4 Mar 184939.6InstalledBishop of Terni, Italy
18 Mar 185242.7AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
29 Sep 185243.2DiedBishop of Forli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Magrini
Bishop Antonio Magrini (born , died ) Bishop of Forli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerucchio, Diocese of Rimini

  • a priest for 20.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 274, and Page 321
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,659
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,849, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast