Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Samuelli

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1790Born
26 Mar 181423.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Montepulciano, Italy
24 Sep 181424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Montepulciano, Italy
27 Jan 184352.4AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
5 Feb 184352.4Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
19 Sep 185464.0DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Claudio Samuelli (VIAF: 89420746)
Bishop Claudio Samuelli (born , died ) Bishop of Montepulciano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontepulciano
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 271
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018