Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Clementi

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1794BornFabrica di Roma
21 Sep 181622.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 184652.5AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
4 Oct 184652.6Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
8 Aug 185157.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
26 Aug 185157.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Central America
26 Aug 185157.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to México
186166.8ResignedApostolic Delegate to Central America
186166.8ResignedApostolic Delegate to México
21 Dec 186369.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Rimini, Italy
30 Jan 186974.9DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Clementi:
Archbishop Luigi Clementi (born , died ) Bishop of Rimini

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 122, and Page 238
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013