Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Cilento

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1806BornNapoli
19 Dec 182923.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 184437.9SelectedBishop of Rossano, Italy
22 Jul 184438.1ConfirmedBishop of Rossano, Italy
28 Jul 184438.1Ordained BishopBishop of Rossano, Italy
21 Mar 188578.7DiedBishop of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Cilento:
Archbishop Pietro Cilento (born , died ) Archbishop of Rossano

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 326

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013